Past Presidents of the Tallahassee Area Dart Association and Tallahassee Dart League | |
Years of Service | Name |
January 7, 2024 - Present | Alison Branch |
January 21, 2017 - January 7, 2024 | Jessica Langston |
January 24, 2015 - January 21, 2017 | Eda Lynn Gronli |
February 2, 2013 - January 24, 2015 | Dan Gabric |
January 24, 2012 - February 2, 2013 | Kelli Dougherty (Interim) |
October XX, 2011 - January 24, 2012 (resigned) | Jessica Robinson (Interim) |
January XX, 2011 - October XX, 2011 (resigned) | Doug Silverblade |
January 24, 2009 - January XX, 2011 | Stewart Nelson |
January XX, 2008 - January 24, 2009 | Sheila Gmeiner |
January 21, 2006 - January XX, 2008 | Lyle Herrick |
?? - January 21, 2006 | Sheila Gmeiner |
??-?? | Mark Johnson |
??-?? | Kelly Gardner |
??-?? | Jim Gavins |
??-?? | Tracey Austin |
??-?? | Denise Mick |
??-?? | Diane Wood Austin |
??-?? | Others? |
??-?? | Dana Stokes? |